Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sanjines Oscar, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Saeedian Michael, against Vanbeek Rodney M., represented by Freed Leesa A. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Charles F. Palmer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles F. Palmer Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2017 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions589 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJury Verdict |
Case Cycle Time565 days |
Proposed Joint Witness List; Filed by: Rodney M. Vanbeek (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Joined Party
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: September 21, 2018Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Proposed Joint Exhibit List; Filed by: Rodney M. Vanbeek (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Court
Date: September 21, 2018Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Joint Statement of the Case; Filed by: Rodney M. Vanbeek (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Joint Jury Instructions; Filed by:
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Joined Party
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Document:Verdict-Special Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Document:Ord for Asgnmt of Trial Judge Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Ord for Asgnmt of Trial Judge
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Proposed Joint Witness List
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Joint Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Proposed Joint Exhibit List
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: December 03, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-08-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.