Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hammond Mark, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Ebrahimian N. Nick, against Ca Southern Baptist Convention Dismissed, Los Angeles Southern Baptist Association, represented by Littler Mendelson P.C., Moreno Martin Esq., Waterkotte Grant D. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gregory W. Alarcon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory W. Alarcon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management158 days |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2017 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial565 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions158 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Conditional Settlement) |
Case Cycle Time687 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service -
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service -
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00RULING RE: MOTION OF DEFENDANT FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION.
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00RULING RE: MOTION OF DEFENDANT FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS.
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE 1102.5(B) ;ETC
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES SOUTHERN BAPTIST ASSOCIATION TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES SOUTHERN BAPTIST ASSOCIATION'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00RULING RE: DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT.
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00DEFENDANT LOS AINGELES SOUTHERN BAPTIST ASSOCIATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Lodging Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Lodging Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Document:General Denial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Mark Hammond (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Mark Hammond (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Response Filed by Mark Hammond (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Filed by Mark Hammond (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Mark Hammond (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Mark Hammond (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Statement of Facts Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Mark Hammond (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Los Angeles Southern Baptist Association, (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Los Angeles Southern Baptist Association, (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Reply to Opposition Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Mark Hammond (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Mark Hammond (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Los Angeles Southern Baptist Association, (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Los Angeles Southern Baptist Association, (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Los Angeles Southern Baptist Association, (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00General Denial Filed by CA Southern Baptist Convention DISMISSED (Defendant)
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Response Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Los Angeles Southern Baptist Association, (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Mark Hammond (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Demurrer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: December 07, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-08-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Response
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-26 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Response
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-29 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (with Prejudice; Complaint; Entire action of all parties and all causes of action)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal))
Date: December 07, 2018Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal) of 12/07/2018)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.