Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bernardino Pascuala, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Law Offices Of Ramin R. Younessi Apc, against Arellano Francisco, Medway Plastics Corporation, Votum Staffing Inc, represented by Flores Aldo A. Esq., Payne & Fears Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Holly E. Kendig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHolly E. Kendig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management150 days |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2016 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions258 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time654 days |
NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 20, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 25, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: January 09, 2017NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL VOTUM STAFFING, INC.'S RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY
Date: September 14, 2017DEFENDANT MED WAY PLASTICS CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: August 09, 2016DEFENDANT FRANCISCO ARELLANO'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: August 30, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-07-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-07-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-07-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-07-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: March 12, 2018Notice
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous)
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: April 27, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.