Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Piemonte Anne, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Carpenter Zuckerman & Rowley Llp, against Beverly Hills Properties, Korolev Yurily Dba Y K Plumbing, Korolev Yurily Dba Y K Plumbing Doe 3, Does 1 To 50, Korolev Yurily, (total of 20) See All represented by Toutant Linda M. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance Courthouse with Cary Nishimoto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCary Nishimoto Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial792 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions224 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseTorrance Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time965 days |
Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Document:Answer to Unverified Cross-Compl Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Document:First Amended Cross Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-01-18T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-01-18T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Deft/X-Deft/X-Comp
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Deft/X-Deft/X-Comp
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-04-12T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Deft/X-Deft/X-Comp
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Document:Affidavit - misc Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Document:Witness List Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Request-Informal Discovery Conf-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-21T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Document:Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal(not entire case) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/X-Deft/X-Comp
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Document:Request for Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Cross-Complainant
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/X-Deft/X-Comp
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2017-02-21T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: December 03, 2018Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: ANNE PIEMONTE (Plaintiff)
Date: December 03, 2018Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 04, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2017ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES
Date: June 26, 2017MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: April 24, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE MENTION OF COLLARERAL SOURCES
Date: September 17, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY OF INDUSTRY STANDARD'S
Date: September 17, 2018DEFENDANTS STERLINGS' NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT KOROLEV'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE 8 THROUGH 10
Date: September 20, 2018Motion in Limine -
Date: September 25, 2018Opposition - Motion in limine
Date: September 25, 2018CROSS-DEFENDANT RAY WEBER'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: September 08, 2016DEFENDANT RAY WEBER'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: September 08, 2016CROSS-DEFENDANTS YURIY KOROLEV AND YK PLUMBING CO.'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: October 14, 2016SUMMONS FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: January 18, 2017FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: January 18, 2017CROSS-DEFENDANTS YURIY KOROLEV AND YK PLUMBING CO.'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2017Complaint
Date: 2016-04-12T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Cross-complaint
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Answer to Complaint
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Summons Filed (CROSS-COMPLAINT )
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (YURILY KOROLEV (DOE 2) )
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Y K PLUMBING CO. (DOE 4) )
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (YURILY KOROLEV DBA Y K PLUMBING (DOE 3) )
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (RAY WEBER (DOE 1) )
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Answer to Unverified Cross-Compl
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Answer to Unverified Cross-Compl (demand for jury trial )
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Answer to Unverified Complaint (demand for jury trial )
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Cross-complaint
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (re 1st c/a, 2nd c/a, 3rd c/a & 4th c/a ***ONLY )
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney ("BY FAX" )
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT; AND ORDER )
Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00First Amended Cross Complaint
Date: 2017-01-18T00:00:00Summons Filed (CROSS-COMPLAINT )
Date: 2017-01-18T00:00:00First Amended Cross Complaint
Date: 2017-01-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-01-18T00:00:00Notice (AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT )
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Notice (AND ACKNOWLEDMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL )
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Answer to Unverified Complaint
Date: 2017-02-21T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2017-02-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-02-21T00:00:00Request-Informal Discovery Conf-PI
Date: 2017-02-21T00:00:00Answer (to first amended cross complaint )
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Partial Dismissal(not entire case) (RE DOE DEFT ONE, RAY WEBER, ONLY WITHOUT PREJ )
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT FORM, JURY FEES $150.00 )
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Receipt (RE: JURY FEES-$150.00 )
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (or, in the alternative, summary adjudication; )
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC & RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES )
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (and/or summary adjudication against pltf Anne Piemonte; )
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (pltfs evidene in supp of opp to msj )
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Opposition Document (*seperate statement in opp to mtn for summary judgment* )
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Opposition Document (opp for def's msj )
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC... )
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem ( LINDA LEE CSR 13568 )
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Order (ORDER RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION )
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Order (MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION )
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (TO CONT TRIAL )
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL )
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 4, ETC... )
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 2, ETC... )
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 3, ETC... )
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 1, ETC... )
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Notice (OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT KOROLEV'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NO. 1 THROUGH 7 )
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 5, ETC... )
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 6, ETC... )
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 7, ETC... )
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 9, ETC... )
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (to continue trial )
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1, ETC...____________________ )
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7, ETC...____________________ )
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3, ETC...____________________ )
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Opposition Document (NO. 4, ETC... )
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Opposition Document (NO. 1, ETC... )
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4, ETC...____________________ )
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 & 8, ETC..._________________ )
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8, ETC...____________________ )
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6, ETC...____________________ )
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 5, ETC... )
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 3, ETC... )
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2, ETC... )
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 4, ETC... )
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 1, ETC... )
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2, ETC... )
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTIN IN LIMINE NO. 2, ETC... )
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 9, ETC... )
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 8, ETC... )
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 10, ETC... )
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1, ETC... )
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00List of Exhibits (FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT )
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (JOINT PAGE AND DESIGNATION(S) FOR DEPOSITION AND FORMER TESTIMONY )
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Statement of Case ([PROPOSED] JOINT )
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions (JOINT )
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00List of Witnesses (JOINT )
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (Election to Forgo Addidavit CCP 170.6 )
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (JOINT TRIAL PAGE AND LINE DESIGNATION(S) FOR DEPOSITION AND FORMER TESTIMONY )
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (LESLIE ELLISON )
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 RE, ETC... )
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Notice (OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT KOROLEV'S MOTION IN LIMINE 8 - 10 )
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. RE TESTIMONY FROM LAY WITNESSES )
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Notice (OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT KOROLEV'S OPPOSITIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 AND 2 )
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Affidavit
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Order (Trial Transfer Order assigned to Judge Nishimoto, Dept E, Torrance )
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Affidavit - misc (ELECTION TO FORGO AFFIDAVIT (CCP 170.6) AS TO JUDGE NISHIMOTO, DEPT E, TORRANCE )
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (AGAINST JUDGE MAURICE LEITER, DEPT A, COMPTON )
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Order (TRIAL TRANSFER ORDER TO JUDGE NISHIMOTO, DEPT. E, TORRANCE )
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: December 03, 2018Order - Dismissal
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : Court's Order to Show Cause))
Date: December 04, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.