Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Baron Teri, Kaplinski Jeff, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gewirtz Maura, Halpern Loren Bennett, Kanarek Martin Joel, against Reifenberg Paul, Rigsby Jeffrey, Ward Laurel, represented by Kommes Hetal J. Esq., Sheedy Christopher Madden, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Charles F. Palmer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles F. Palmer Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2015 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial743 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions617 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time1222 days |
Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Teri Baron (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Laurel Ward (Defendant); Jeffrey Rigsby (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Order Conditionally Granting Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Notice OF ACCEPTANCE AND CONSENT TO ADDITUR; Filed by: Laurel Ward (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Teri Baron (Plaintiff)
Date: July 11, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 21, 2016Motion to Tax Costs
Date: May 17, 2019Motion for New Trial
Date: May 20, 2019Order - ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: June 11, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS)
Date: June 27, 2019ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT PAUL REIFENBERG; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY
Date: October 04, 2016Answer
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-01 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel)
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Joint Witness List Attorney Copy of Witnesses
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : Trial))
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00ELECTION TO FORGO AFFIDAVIT (CCP 170.6)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Palmer, Dept. 33, Central, OTR forthwith)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Telephonic Conference))
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Laurel Ward (Defendant); Jeffrey Rigsby (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: Teri Baron (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Association of Counsel; Filed by: Jeff Kaplinski (Plaintiff); Teri Baron (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Laurel Ward (Defendant); Jeffrey Rigsby (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Laurel Ward (Defendant); Jeffrey Rigsby (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial (Amended); Filed by: Teri Baron (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Jury Instructions - Given; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00ELECTION TO FORGO AFFIDAVIT (CCP 170.6); Filed by: Laurel Ward (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Laurel Ward (Defendant); Jeffrey Rigsby (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal(not entire case) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Laurel Ward (Defendant); Jeffrey Rigsby (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Teri Baron (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Teri Baron (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: Teri Baron (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Laurel Ward (Defendant); Jeffrey Rigsby (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Laurel Ward (Defendant); Jeffrey Rigsby (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order to Judge Palmer, Dept. 33, Central, OTR forthwith; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Motion for New Trial
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order Conditionally Granting Motion for New Trial])
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Submission of Judgment))
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial per C.C.P. 657 and 662.5))
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Telephonic))
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/16/2019)
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Verdict
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Judgment on Special Verdict))
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Jury Instructions (- Given)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Judgment (on Special Verdict)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Opposition (DEFT'S OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MOTION FOR ADDITUR OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial ((Amended))
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: July 11, 2019Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs))
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Order Conditionally Granting Motion for New Trial
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Notice (OF ACCEPTANCE AND CONSENT TO ADDITUR)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Notice (OF DEFENDANT LAUREL WARD'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS SOUGHT BY PLAINTIFF TERI BARON-OFF CALENDAR)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.