Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hernandez Candelaria, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Stoll Nussbaum & Polakov A.P.C., against Dearias Santos, Del Pueblo Mercado, International Outlet Inc., Pueblo Mercado Del, Reichart Andreas Doe 2, (total of 7) See All represented by Daigneault Abel & Daigneault, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mary Ann Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary Ann Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2015 |
CategoryPremise Liability (E.G., Dangerous Conditions Of Property, Slip/Trip And Fall, Dog Attack, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial727 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions323 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment By Court |
Case Cycle Time827 days |
Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2016-09-07T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-09-09T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Document:Statement of Damages Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 14, 2017Document:Judgment Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -
Date: July 26, 2016Proof of Service by Substituted Service -
Date: July 26, 2016DEFENDANT ANDREAS REICHART'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: October 13, 2016DEFENDANT CHONG HUI REICHART'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: December 07, 2016Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-09-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2016-09-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-23 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-09 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-25 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-05 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-15 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-04 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-10 00:00:00
Date: September 10, 2018Judgment
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.