Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Campos Isaias, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by O'Connor & Mikhov Llp, against American Honda Motor Co. Inc., represented by Webb-Akasaka Jamie L. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael J. Raphael presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael J. Raphael Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateNovember 18, 2014 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions378 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time357 days |
Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-03-12T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2015-02-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-11-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-04-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-12-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2014-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2015-09-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: December 23, 2015Request for Dismissal
Date: November 10, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.