Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Los Angeles City Of, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Medellin Oscar Deputy City Attorney, against Glen Property Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Kenji Machida presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenji Machida Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2012 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions74 days |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time176 days |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 31, 2012Complaint
Date: 2012-09-20T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2012-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2012-10-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2012-12-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 15, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.