Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Eastern Columbia Lofts Homeowners Associ-, filed a(n) Construction - Torts case represented by Fenton Grant Mayfield Kaneda & Litt Llp, against 849 Broadway Real Estate Llc, represented by Hamrick A. Raymond Iii Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with William A. MacLaughlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam A. MacLaughlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management317 days |
Filing DateJune 03, 2011 |
CategoryConstruction Defect (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial1267 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1185 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeConstruction |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time1841 days |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-06-03T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-10-14T00:00:00Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant
Date: 2014-10-30T00:00:00Reply to Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-06-07T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2013-06-03T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-06-03T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Notice Filed by Eastern Columbia Lofts Homeowners Associ- (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant
Date: 2014-04-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-04-22T00:00:00Notice Filed by Eastern Columbia Lofts Homeowners Associ- (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-10-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2013-07-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-07-16T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2012-09-17T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-10-15T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2012-09-28T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2013-06-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2012-12-14T00:00:00Document:Defendant's Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2012-12-14T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-06-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Defendant
Date: 2015-10-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Notice Filed by Eastern Columbia Lofts Homeowners Associ- (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-04-22T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Document:Defendant's Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2012-11-15T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Document:Decree Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2015-11-18T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-04T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: October 12, 2017Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-10T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2012-09-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Notice Filed by Eastern Columbia Lofts Homeowners Associ- (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-09-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Eastern Columbia Lofts Homeowners Associ- (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Memorandum - Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-09-22T00:00:00Reply to Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Response Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Response Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-09-22T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Trial Filed by Eastern Columbia Lofts Homeowners Associ- (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: October 12, 2017Motion in Limine Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2015-06-11T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2013-03-15T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice - Cause Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2012-11-15T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by 849 Broadway Real Estate, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2013-07-30T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Eastern Columbia Lofts Homeowners Associ- (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Eastern Columbia Lofts Homeowners Associ- (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-12-07T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Brief Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2011-06-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2012-09-17T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2012-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2012-09-28T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2012-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2012-12-03T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Cause (170.1/170.3)
Date: 2012-11-15T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2012-11-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2012-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2012-12-07T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2012-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2013-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2013-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2013-05-30T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2013-06-07T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2013-06-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2013-07-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-06-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2013-07-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2013-07-30T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2014-04-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-10-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2014-04-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-08-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-05-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-06-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2014-10-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-08-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-06-07T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2012-09-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-10-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2013-06-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by 849 Broadway Real Estate, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2012-12-14T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2013-07-31T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2012-09-19T00:00:00Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2015-10-07T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer Filed by 849 Broadway Real Estate, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2012-11-15T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-05-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-31T00:00:00Notice Filed by Eastern Columbia Lofts Homeowners Associ- (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-08-04T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Cause (170.1/170.3) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2012-11-15T00:00:00Notice Filed by Eastern Columbia Lofts Homeowners Associ- (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2013-03-12T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-05-14T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-15T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2012-12-07T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Eastern Columbia Lofts Homeowners Associ- (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-09-17T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-09-22T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-07-16T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2015-10-07T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2012-12-03T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-05-30T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-07-30T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2014-10-30T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2012-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-05-30T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-06-03T00:00:00Document:Notice of Trial Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2013-03-12T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2014-04-03T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2013-06-03T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2012-12-03T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2015-10-07T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer Filed by 849 Broadway Real Estate, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2012-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-09-22T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2015-09-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2015-09-22T00:00:00Response
Date: 2015-09-22T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Response
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2015-10-07T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-12-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-02-10T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Trial
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
Date: October 12, 2017Witness List
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.