Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case against Marquez Mabelle Ann, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Marvin Lager presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarvin Lager Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2008 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions64 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time134 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest Filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff) |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Creditor |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by Creditor |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM, AND ORDER APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Creditor |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Renewal of Judgment Filed by Creditor |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY | |
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.