Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
2000 Charles B. Benenson Decedants' Trust, Benenson Charles B., Benenson Jane Stein, Benenson William, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Duff James T. Law Offices Of, Rosen Kevin S. Esq., against Blattmachr Jonathan, Brown Michael, Cm Life Insurance Company, Executive Compensation Group Inc., Kreisberg Amie, (total of 10) See All represented by Arriandiaga Marta B. Esq., Diamond Michael H., Hunter Craig Esq., Joffe Steven J. Esq., Strickland Julia B., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with William F. Fahey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam F. Fahey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateJune 05, 2003 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time593 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Missing at time of scanning | |
November 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Case File | |
January 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department 78 (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) - |
|
January 18, 2005 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 13, 2005 | Hearing |
Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by William Benenson (Plaintiff); 2000 Charles B. Benenson Decedants' Trust (Plaintiff); Jane Stein Benenson (Plaintiff) et al. |
|
January 13, 2005 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
January 07, 2005 | Hearing |
Notice of Ruling Filed by William Benenson (Plaintiff); 2000 Charles B. Benenson Decedants' Trust (Plaintiff); Jane Stein Benenson (Plaintiff) et al. |
|
January 07, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL | |
January 05, 2005 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
in Department 78 (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.