Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Office Of The General Counsel Wells Fargo, against Fem Engineering Inc, Sarhangnezhad Ali, represented by Hanigan Timothy R. Esq., Lang Hanigan & Carvalho Law Offices Of, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Samantha Jessner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamantha Jessner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management142 days |
Filing DateApril 03, 2002 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial321 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1248 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time1129 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2020 | Hearing |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/19/2020) Filed by Clerk |
|
June 19, 2020 | Hearing |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 25, James E. Blancarte, Presiding Court Order Judge: James E. Blancarte |
|
September 06, 2019 | Hearing |
Notice (of Court Order re Reassignment Pursuant to Recusal) Filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA (Plaintiff) |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 1, Samantha Jessner, Presiding Court Order Judge: Samantha Jessner |
|
August 28, 2019 | Hearing |
Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment Pursuant to Recusal)) Filed by Clerk |
|
August 28, 2019 | Hearing |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment Pursuant to Recusal) of 08/28/2019) Filed by Clerk |
|
August 19, 2019 | Hearing |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Edward B. Moreton |
|
July 02, 2019 | Hearing |
Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.