Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Slack Robert F., filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Teecher June Esq., against Cedars Sinai Center, Karlan Scott Md, represented by Pivo Kenneth R., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Alice E. Altoon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlice E. Altoon Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 02, 2002 |
CategoryMed Malpractice (Drs & Surgeons) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeSummary Judgment Per 437C Ccp |
Case Cycle Time379 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
in Department 28, Alice E. Altoon, Presiding OSC RE Dismissal - OSC Discharged OSC RE Dismissal - OSC Discharged Judge: Alice E. Altoon |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
in Department 28, Alice E. Altoon, Presiding OSC RE Dismissal - OSC Discharged Judge: Alice E. Altoon |
|
May 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 22, 2006 | Hearing |
Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 07, 2006 | Hearing |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
in Department 28, Alice E. Altoon, Presiding Court Order - Completed Court Order - Completed Judge: Alice E. Altoon |
|
April 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
in Department 28, Alice E. Altoon, Presiding Court Order - Completed Judge: Alice E. Altoon |
|
March 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 28, 2006 | Hearing |
Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.