Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
U.S. Xpress Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Zide & O'Biecunas Law Offices Of, against Highland Transportation Service Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael Berg presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 1998 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeOther Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 1999 | Docket Event |
in Department 1A, Murray Gross, Presiding Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng - Completed Judge: Murray Gross |
|
November 18, 1998 | Docket Event |
in Department 1A, Murray Gross, Presiding Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng - Off Calendar Judge: Murray Gross |
|
October 09, 1998 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution filed (Los Angeles County issued 7-15-98 ) Filed by Attorney for Creditor |
|
August 03, 1998 | Docket Event |
in Department 1A, Murray Gross, Presiding Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng - Off Calendar Judge: Murray Gross |
|
July 15, 1998 | Hearing |
Appl for Writ of Execution & Ord Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
July 15, 1998 | Hearing |
Writ issued (L.A CO. ) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 28, 1998 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
April 28, 1998 | Hearing |
Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
April 28, 1998 | Hearing |
Waiver (OF ATTORNEY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
April 28, 1998 | Hearing |
Partial Dismissal(not entire case) (AS TO DOE I through X ) Filed by Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.