Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Herman Ross, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Broudy Benjamin Law Offices, against Rossana Howell, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Dzintra Janavs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDzintra Janavs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 09, 1990 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Pi/Pd/Wd (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeOther Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 1991 | Docket Event | Award-Arbitrator | |
November 28, 1990 | Hearing |
in Department 21, Jerry K. Fields, Presiding Order to Show Cause - Off Calendar Judge: Jerry K. Fields |
|
November 01, 1990 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint | |
September 28, 1990 | Docket Event | Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl | |
August 09, 1990 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.