Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Guevara, Michael, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Arellano, Geovana, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Somnath Raj Chatterjee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSomnath Raj Chatterjee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2020 |
Order to Show Cause re
Judge: Somnath Raj Chatterjee |
||
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Dismissed | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Administrative Transfer of Case Within County (Same Jurisdiction) to Hayward Hall of Justi | |
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to OSC - Family Law 07/10/2020 08:45 AM D- 503 | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed for Michael Guevara | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 06/22/2020 03:30 PM D- 503 | |
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of re progress of Family Law Action Filed | |
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service on Petition for Dissolution of Marriage As to Michael Guevara Filed | |
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.