Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Martinez, Richard Valdez, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Anaya, Robert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnaya, Robert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2004 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Release on Dismissals | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Anaya, Robert |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
March 01, 2004 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Abstract | |
March 01, 2004 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
February 27, 2004 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Appear | |
February 12, 2004 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.