Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Kevin Sheehan, filed a(n) M90 - Misc - All Other case represented by Sabatini & Associates Llc, against Barry Scalpen, Eco Recovery Solutions, Llc, represented by Jackson Lewis Pc, in the jurisdiction of Windham County, CT, . Windham County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Matthew Edward Auger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2023 |
CategoryM90 - Misc - All Other |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationWindham County, CT |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES/PRODUCTION PB 13-8 and 13-10
Date: June 23, 2023SUMMONS
Date: January 05, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/11/2024 HON MARK ALTERMATT
Date: March 11, 2024ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: March 09, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2023MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RESULT: Granted 3/11/2024 HON MARK ALTERMATT
Date: February 28, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/17/2023 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: May 17, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: August 02, 2023REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: April 13, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER joint
Date: April 27, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: January 05, 2023MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/11/2024 HON MARK ALTERMATT
Date: February 28, 2024MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 3/13/2023 HON MATTHEW AUGER
Date: February 23, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: January 24, 2023CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6 CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: April 13, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/13/2023 HON MATTHEW AUGER
Date: March 13, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: January 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2025 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
February 25, 2025 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
February 14, 2025 | Remote Trial Management Conference | ||
December 02, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
November 26, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
November 05, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
October 25, 2024 | Remote Trial Management Conference | ||
August 30, 2024 | Remote Pretrial Conference | ||
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/11/2024 HON MARK ALTERMATT | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RESULT: Granted 3/11/2024 HON MARK ALTERMATT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.