Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Ironhorse Auto, Llc, D B A Central Hyundai, filed a(n) T90 - Torts - All Other case represented by Feiner Wolfson Llc, against Brent Mattson, represented by O'Sullivan Mccormack Jensen & Bliss Pc, in the jurisdiction of Windham County, CT, . Windham County, CT Superior Courts with Jack W. Fischer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJack W. Fischer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
CategoryT90 - Torts - All Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationWindham County, CT |
|
OBJECTION TO MOTION Objection To Motion To Strike
Date: October 20, 2021CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE Notice of Service of Amended Responses to Discovery
Date: April 26, 2022REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE AND ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM
Date: April 25, 2022WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION Answer to Special Defenses and Counterclaim
Date: April 25, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RESULT: Granted 12/6/2021 HON JACK FISCHER
Date: November 18, 2021CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) Correct order at 143.11
Date: January 19, 2023OBJECTION Objection To Defendant's Motion Re: Sanctions
Date: September 30, 2022MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Memo of law in support of motion to strike
Date: September 29, 2021OBJECTION TO REQUEST TO REVISE RESULT: Order 8/4/2021 HON ANN LYNCH
Date: July 16, 2021CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 2/23/2023 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: February 16, 2023MOTION FOR NONSUIT FOR FAILURE TO PLEAD
Date: August 31, 2021ORDER RESULT: Off 4/19/2022 HON JACK FISCHER
Date: April 19, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/6/2021 HON JACK FISCHER
Date: December 06, 2021PROPOSED ORDER Proposed order of compliance, re #121.00 RESULT: Order 1/17/2023 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: November 07, 2022ORDER RESULT: Off 10/5/2022 HON JACK FISCHER
Date: October 05, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 8/15/2022 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: August 15, 2022OBJECTION TO MOTION Objection To Defendant's Motion Re: Sanctions
Date: January 13, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 8/4/2021 HON ANN LYNCH
Date: August 04, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 11/8/2022 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: November 08, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/24/2022 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: June 24, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE Of #139
Date: November 07, 2022ORDER RESULT: Off 8/4/2022 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: August 04, 2022SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN
Date: June 07, 2021REQUEST TO REVISE RESULT: Order 8/4/2021 HON ANN LYNCH
Date: July 14, 2021SUMMONS
Date: May 27, 2021REPLY MEMORANDUM Reply brief re motion to strike
Date: November 01, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 27, 2021MOTION FOR COUNSEL FEES
Date: December 21, 2023ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE AND COUNTERCLAIM
Date: February 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of David Cartwright
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBITS Exhibit to reply memo 171.00
Date: February 23, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/2/2023 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: February 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of W. O'Sullivan in support of MSJ
Date: March 06, 2023ORDER RESULT: Overruled 11/21/2023 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: November 21, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/10/2024 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: January 10, 2024NOTICE OF INTENTION TO ARGUE OR PRESENT TESTIMONY PB 11-18(a)(2)
Date: April 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of J. Brown in support of MSJ
Date: March 06, 2023MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 6/24/2022 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: June 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Ellen Jones
Date: June 06, 2023ORDER RESULT: Off 1/10/2024 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: January 10, 2024ORDER RESULT: Overruled 4/26/2023 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: April 26, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/26/2023 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: April 26, 2023MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESULT: Granted 11/21/2023 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: March 06, 2023OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Objection to 115.00
Date: December 13, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/24/2022 HON JACK FISCHER
Date: February 24, 2022REVISED COMPLAINT
Date: September 27, 2021OBJECTION TO MOTION OR REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY PB CH13
Date: April 18, 2022MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Memo of law in support of motion to strike
Date: April 26, 2022MOTION TO STRIKE RESULT: Order 1/18/2022 HON JACK FISCHER
Date: September 29, 2021MEMORANDUM OF DECISION
Date: November 21, 2023REPLY MEMORANDUM Reply memorandum re motion for summary judgment
Date: June 15, 2023NOTICE OF INTENTION TO ARGUE OR PRESENT TESTIMONY PB 11-18(a)(2)
Date: April 18, 2023ORDER RESULT: Off 12/12/2022 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: December 12, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 1/18/2022 HON JACK FISCHER
Date: January 18, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/12/2021 HON JACK FISCHER
Date: October 12, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 1/5/2022 HON JACK FISCHER
Date: January 05, 2022MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 6/24/2022 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: June 22, 2022MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PB 13-5 RESULT: Granted 10/12/2021 HON JACK FISCHER
Date: September 24, 2021NOTICE OF INTENTION TO ARGUE OR PRESENT TESTIMONY PB 11-18(a)(2)
Date: September 30, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/15/2022 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: August 15, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/23/2023 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: February 23, 2023REPLY Sur-Reply Brief Regarding Defendant's Motion To Strike
Date: November 09, 2021APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: June 14, 2021NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES Notice of Compliance re: Amended Responses to Discovery
Date: August 11, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Compliance Re: Bullet Point Responses
Date: September 14, 2022CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) Enter #139.00 as order of the court
Date: November 07, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: May 27, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN
Date: July 14, 2021MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 2/23/2023 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: February 16, 2023REPLY MEMORANDUM Reply memo re motion for attorneys' fees, 164.00
Date: February 23, 2024STIPULATION Stipulated protective order
Date: September 24, 2021OBJECTION TO MOTION Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees
Date: February 07, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/21/2024 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: January 21, 2024CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) Caseflow Request regarding Proposed Order
Date: November 14, 2022PROPOSED ORDER RESULT: Order 1/19/2023 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: November 14, 2022ORDER RESULT: Denied 6/15/2023 HON KAREN DEMEOLA
Date: June 15, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/21/2023 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: November 21, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/15/2024 HON ERIK LOHR
Date: February 15, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2024 | Remote Hearing | ||
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS Exhibit to reply memo 171.00 | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | REPLY MEMORANDUM Reply memo re motion for attorneys' fees, 164.00 | |
February 20, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-10 #005 | ||
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/15/2024 HON ERIK LOHR | |
February 13, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-10 #003 | ||
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO MOTION Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees | |
January 29, 2024 | Remote Hearing | ||
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Object to Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees RESULT: Granted 2/15/2024 HON ERIK LOHR | |
January 21, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/21/2024 HON ERIK LOHR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.