Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by London & London, against Shannon Sauro, represented by 150 Spicer Road, in the jurisdiction of Windham County, CT, . Windham County, CT Superior Courts with John M. Newson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn M. Newson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2017 |
CategoryS00 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Collection - Credit Card (Original Owner) |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWindham County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION-WAGES (JD-CV-3)
Date: March 04, 2020LETTER
Date: August 11, 2017SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40
Date: July 21, 2017SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2017MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 21, 2017EXECUTION ISSUED - WAGES
Date: March 06, 2020ACCEPTANCE OF INSTALLMENT PAYMENT SCHEDULE - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: October 25, 2017ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: August 09, 2017SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: April 30, 2020ORDER RESULT: Order 11/3/2017 HON JOHN NEWSON
Date: November 03, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - SMALL CLAIMS | |
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | EXECUTION ISSUED - WAGES | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION-WAGES (JD-CV-3) | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL-GENERAL RESULT: HON JOHN NEWSON | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 11/3/2017 HON JOHN NEWSON | |
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event | ACCEPTANCE OF INSTALLMENT PAYMENT SCHEDULE - SMALL CLAIMS | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
August 09, 2017 | Docket Event | ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS | |
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40 | |
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.