Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mohammed Nazim Uddin, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by 256 Scott Drive, against Destiney Renee Finez, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts with HON JENNIFER MACIEROWSKI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON JENNIFER MACIEROWSKI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 22, 2022 |
CategoryF00 - Family - Dissolution Of Marriage - C.G.S. Chapter 815J |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FILE Agreement dated 10/6/2022 incorporated by reference | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 2/14/2023 HON JENNIFER MACIEROWSKI | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | RECORD CORRECTION RESULT: Order 2/14/2023 HON JENNIFER MACIEROWSKI Watermark Last Updated: Legend Code - 04/25/2023 | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION AFTER HEARING UPON DEFAULT RESULT: HON JENNIFER MACIEROWSKI | |
February 14, 2023 | Case Date | ||
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE Renee Finez Destiny | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT Amended Summons and Complaint Last Updated: Additional Description - 01/23/2023 | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 1/10/2023 HON SUZANNE CARON | |
January 10, 2023 | Remote Case Date | ||
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER - FAMILY MATTERS RESULT: Order 10/11/2022 HON SUZANNE CARON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.