Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cynthia T. Smith, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Christine M Whitehead, against Frank A. Smith, Jr., represented by Frank A. Smith Jr., in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts with HON LINDA PRESTLEY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 17, 2017 |
CategoryF00 - Family - Dissolution Of Marriage - C.G.S. Chapter 815J |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (QDRO) RESULT: Granted 12/18/2017 HON LINDA PRESTLEY | |
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION TO COURT OF PARENTING EDUCATION PROGRAM RESULTS BY FAM DIV CGS SEC. 46b-69b(c) | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PARTY PARTICIPATION IN PARENTING EDUCATION PROGRAM CGS SEC 46B-69B | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION RESULT: HON LINDA PRESTLEY | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | RECORD CORRECTION Last Updated: Multiple Field Correction - 06/16/2017 | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-LONG FRANK SMITH | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FILE | |
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-LONG | |
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT CONCERNING CHILDREN | |
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | WORKSHEET FOR THE CONNECTICUT CHILD SUPPORT AND ARREARAGE GUIDELINES CCSG-1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.