Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Rtg Management Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by 305 S Main St, against Anhar Eldesouky, represented by 406, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2023 |
CategoryS55 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 07, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 12/18/2023 PATRICK KENNEDY, MAG
Date: December 18, 2023ORDER RESULT: Rejected 1/17/2024 BY THE CLERK
Date: January 17, 2024RETURNED MAIL
Date: November 22, 2023RETURNED MAIL
Date: January 02, 2024APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION-WAGES (JD-CV-3) RESULT: Rejected 1/17/2024 BY THE CLERK
Date: January 16, 2024SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40
Date: September 22, 2023RETURNED MAIL
Date: November 13, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 10/30/2023 PATRICK KENNEDY, MAG
Date: October 30, 2023SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF EXECUTION (JD-CV-3a/JD-CV-24A/JD-CV-5b) - SMALL CLAIMS additional form filled out per Judo Notice | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Rejected 1/17/2024 BY THE CLERK | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION-WAGES (JD-CV-3) RESULT: Rejected 1/17/2024 BY THE CLERK | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 12/18/2023 PATRICK KENNEDY, MAG | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL FOR PLAINTIFF RESULT: PATRICK KENNEDY, MAG | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 10/30/2023 PATRICK KENNEDY, MAG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.