Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Carolyn Vitelli, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Cicchiello & Cicchiello Llp, against Wei Ruling, represented by Tang And Maravelis Pc, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts ROCKVILLE JD with Matthew D. Gordon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2023 |
CategoryT03 - Torts - Defective Premises - Private - Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseROCKVILLE JD |
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 1/11/2024 BY THE COURT
Date: January 10, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/11/2024 BY THE COURT
Date: January 11, 2024MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE DISCOVERY MOTION OR REQUEST PB CH13
Date: July 03, 2023REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: June 06, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 21, 2023ORDER RESULT: Off 8/9/2023 HON MATTHEW GORDON Last Updated: Document Moved - 11/03/2023
Date: August 09, 2023MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9)
Date: July 20, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: August 04, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 21, 2023SUMMONS
Date: March 21, 2023CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: June 06, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: July 17, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/3/2023 HON MATTHEW GORDON
Date: November 03, 2023ORDER RESULT: Accepted 6/5/2023 BY THE COURT
Date: June 05, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 17, 2023MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 11/3/2023 HON MATTHEW GORDON
Date: November 02, 2023NOTICE Notice of Service of Discovery
Date: April 28, 2023ORDER RESULT: Rejected 5/15/2023 BY THE COURT
Date: May 15, 2023ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: June 05, 2023CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: June 05, 2023ORDER RESULT: Off 8/9/2023 HON MATTHEW GORDON
Date: August 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 18, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 17, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 11, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 10, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
September 03, 2024 | Remote Trial Management Conference | ||
July 12, 2024 | Remote Pretrial Conference | ||
January 12, 2024 | Remote Pretrial Conference | ||
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/11/2024 BY THE COURT | |
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 1/11/2024 BY THE COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.