Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ayr Properties Sep Llc, Michael Derrick, filed a(n) H00 - Housing - Summary Process case represented by Joseph Robert Sastre, against Aaron Bowman, Jane Doe, John Aka Daniel F. Sierra Doe, represented by 47 Linden Street, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts with Carletha S. Parkinson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2022 |
CategoryH00 - Housing - Summary Process |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
|
HOUSING SUMMARY PROCESS SUMMONS (JD-HM-32)
Date: July 05, 2022APPEARANCE
Date: July 11, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 05, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: July 05, 2022NOTICE TO QUIT POSSESSION - ORIGINAL SUMMARY PROCESS
Date: July 05, 2022ORDER RESULT: Accepted 9/2/2022 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: September 02, 2022WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION RESULT: Accepted 9/2/2022 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: September 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT CARES Act. Property is not a covered dwelling.
Date: July 06, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 7/5/2022 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: July 05, 2022ORDER RESULT: Denied 8/4/2022 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: August 04, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 8/4/2022 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: August 04, 2022ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: July 29, 2022REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: August 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Accepted 9/2/2022 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION RESULT: Accepted 9/2/2022 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION RESULT: HON CARLETHA PARKINSON | |
September 02, 2022 | Trial | ||
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | RECORD CORRECTION RESULT: Granted 8/4/2022 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON Watermark Last Updated: Legend Code - 08/04/2022 | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Denied 8/4/2022 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 8/4/2022 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION SUMMARY PROCESS RESULT: Order 8/4/2022 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.