Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
David B. Forsley, filed a(n) H00 - Housing - Summary Process case represented by 3 Emily Drive, against Kimberly Fisher, represented by 33 Spring St, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts with Carletha S. Parkinson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2022 |
CategoryH00 - Housing - Summary Process |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
|
COMPLAINT
Date: August 05, 2022HOUSING SUMMARY PROCESS SUMMONS (JD-HM-32)
Date: August 05, 2022REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: August 23, 2022STIPULATION RESULT: Accepted 9/13/2022 HON DONNA WILKERSON BRILLANT
Date: September 09, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 05, 2022NOTICE TO QUIT POSSESSION - ORIGINAL SUMMARY PROCESS
Date: August 05, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 8/9/2022 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON
Date: August 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT Plaintiff's CARES ACT Affidavit
Date: August 15, 2022ORDER RESULT: Accepted 9/13/2022 HON DONNA WILKERSON BRILLANT
Date: September 13, 2022APPEARANCE
Date: September 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Accepted 9/13/2022 HON DONNA WILKERSON BRILLANT | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF WITH FINAL STAY BY STIPULATION RESULT: HON DONNA WILKERSON BRILLANT | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION RESULT: Accepted 9/13/2022 HON DONNA WILKERSON BRILLANT | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
September 09, 2022 | Trial | ||
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT Plaintiff's CARES ACT Affidavit | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 8/9/2022 HON CARLETHA PARKINSON | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | HOUSING SUMMARY PROCESS SUMMONS (JD-HM-32) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.