Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Nancy Yoho, Terry Yoho, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Biller Sachs & Robert, against State Farm Fire And Casualty Company, represented by Halloran & Sage Llp, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts with Matthew D. Gordon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2021 |
CategoryM40 - Misc - Arbitration |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
APPLICATION Application to Compel Appraisal as Served
Date: October 20, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/26/2021 BY THE COURT
Date: October 26, 2021MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Re: Remote Hearing 11/22 RESULT: Granted 11/22/2021 BY THE COURT
Date: November 22, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/22/2021 BY THE COURT
Date: November 22, 2021SUMMONS
Date: October 07, 2021APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: December 06, 2021SUMMONS FOR HEARING Summons for Hearing as Served - Corrected
Date: October 20, 2021APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: October 25, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/22/2022 HON MATTHEW GORDON
Date: February 22, 2022SUMMONS FOR HEARING
Date: October 20, 2021PRE-SERVICE ORDER FOR HEARING AND NOTICE
Date: October 07, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/7/2022 BY THE COURT
Date: April 07, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/13/2022 BY THE COURT
Date: July 13, 2022PRE-SERVICE ORDER FOR HEARING AND NOTICE REMOTE DATE ASSIGNED BY CASEFLOW
Date: October 12, 2021CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) re: 2-22-2022 Hearing RESULT: Granted 2/22/2022 HON MATTHEW GORDON
Date: February 22, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2021ORDER OF NOTICE AS SERVED
Date: October 20, 2021WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION Withdrawal
Date: July 28, 2022MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 10/26/2021 BY THE COURT
Date: October 26, 2021APPLICATION
Date: October 07, 2021PROPOSED ORDER
Date: October 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION Withdrawal | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
July 18, 2022 | Remote Status Conference | ||
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/13/2022 BY THE COURT | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) Plaintiff's Caseflow Request RESULT: Granted 7/13/2022 BY THE COURT | |
April 22, 2022 | Remote Status Conference | ||
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/7/2022 BY THE COURT | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE re: 4-22-2022 Status Conference RESULT: Granted 4/7/2022 BY THE COURT | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/22/2022 HON MATTHEW GORDON | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) re: 2-22-2022 Hearing RESULT: Granted 2/22/2022 HON MATTHEW GORDON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.