Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Geraldo Rosado #283016, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Bansley Anthony Burdo Llc, against Commissioner Of Correction, represented by State'S Attorney-Jd New Haven, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts with Hunchu Kwak presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHunchu Kwak Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2016 |
CategoryM30 - Misc - Habeas Corpus (Extradition Release From Penal Institution) |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2021 | ROSADO, GERALDO #283016 v. COMMISSIONER OF CORRECTION | ||
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | CONSOLIDATED WITH ANOTHER CASE RECORD SEE CLERK'S NOTES IN THIS FILE RESULT: HON HUNCHU KWAK | |
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER SEE FILE RESULT: Order 8/8/2016 BY THE COURT | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WAIVE ENTRY FEE AND PAY COSTS OF SERVICE RESULT: Granted 8/5/2016 BY THE COURT | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.