Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Geovanny # Zillo #365810, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Goddard Jason C Law Office Of Llc, Osborn Correctional Institute, against Commissioner Of Correction, represented by State'S Attorney-Jd Waterbury, in the jurisdiction of Tolland County, CT, . Tolland County, CT Superior Courts with Vernon D. Oliver presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2020 |
CategoryM30 - Misc - Habeas Corpus (Extradition Release From Penal Institution) |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationTolland County, CT |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
ORDER RESULT: Order 5/14/2020 BY THE COURT
Date: May 14, 2020ORDER RESULT: Denied 9/10/2021 HON VERNON OLIVER
Date: September 10, 2021ORDER RESULT: Denied 7/7/2021 HON TEJAS BHATT
Date: July 07, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/7/2021 HON TEJAS BHATT
Date: July 07, 2021ORDER RESULT: Off 9/8/2020 HON VERNON OLIVER
Date: September 08, 2020MOTION - SEE FILE Motion for Discovery RESULT: Denied 7/7/2021 HON TEJAS BHATT
Date: June 17, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Accepted 12/7/2020 HON VERNON OLIVER
Date: December 03, 2020ORDER RESULT: Off 3/2/2021 HON TEJAS BHATT
Date: March 02, 2021ORDER RESULT: Off 6/15/2021 HON TEJAS BHATT
Date: June 15, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 2/3/2021 HON TEJAS BHATT
Date: February 03, 2021CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST Accepted Scheduling Order
Date: December 07, 2020APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: July 15, 2020NOTICE Notice of Address Change
Date: June 30, 2021LIST OF EXHIBITS (JD-CL-28/JD-CL-28a)
Date: December 04, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/14/2022 HON VERNON OLIVER
Date: March 14, 2022REQUEST Request and Notice for Discovery
Date: November 18, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: March 25, 2022REQUEST
Date: August 21, 2023NOTICE
Date: August 21, 2023RETURN TO WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS
Date: August 21, 2023LIST OF WITNESSES
Date: August 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | LIST OF EXHIBITS (JD-CL-28/JD-CL-28a) | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | TRIAL COMPLETED-DECISION RESERVED RESULT: HON EMILY WAGNER | |
October 25, 2023 | Trial | ||
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN TO WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS | |
August 04, 2023 | Remote Trial Management Conference | ||
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | LIST OF WITNESSES | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST Request and Notice for Discovery |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.