Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Schreiber Law Llc, against James E Gillespie, in the jurisdiction of New London County, CT, . New London County, CT Superior Courts with Karen A. Goodrow presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2023 |
CategoryC40 - Contracts - Collections |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew London County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
COMPLAINT
Date: July 28, 2023NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: October 10, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 28, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/31/2023 HON KAREN GOODROW
Date: August 31, 2023SUMMONS
Date: July 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/31/2023 HON KAREN GOODROW | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL-PRACTICE BOOK SECTION 17-23 ET SEQ RESULT: HON KAREN GOODROW | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO APPEAR AND JUDGMENT WITH ORDER OF PAYMENTS PB SECTION 17-23 RESULT: Granted 8/31/2023 HON KAREN GOODROW | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.