Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Charter Oak Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Conway Londregan Sheehan & Monaco P.C., against Carmelita P. Dio, represented by 35 Harbor View Lane, in the jurisdiction of New London County, CT, . New London County, CT Superior Courts with Karen A. Goodrow presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 10, 2023 |
CategoryC40 - Contracts - Collections |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew London County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: November 29, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/27/2023 HON ANGELICA PAPASTAVROS
Date: November 27, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 8/14/2023 HON KAREN GOODROW
Date: August 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 10, 2023APPEARANCE
Date: August 10, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: July 10, 2023SUMMONS
Date: July 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/27/2023 HON ANGELICA PAPASTAVROS | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL FOR PLAINTIFF RESULT: HON ANGELICA PAPASTAVROS | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT and order of Weekly Payments RESULT: Granted 11/27/2023 HON ANGELICA PAPASTAVROS | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Denied 8/14/2023 HON KAREN GOODROW | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO APPEAR AND JUDGMENT WITH ORDER OF PAYMENTS PB SECTION 17-23 RESULT: Denied 8/14/2023 HON KAREN GOODROW | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.