Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Caliber Home Loans, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mccalla Raymer Leibert Pierce Llc, against Connecticut Housing Finance Authority, Julia Z. Dicandio, Trustee Of The Thomas R. Coty Irrevocable Trust Dated February 20, 2008, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, Thomas R. Coty, represented by 22 Longview Ave, in the jurisdiction of New London County, CT, . New London County, CT Superior Courts Superior with James Field Spallone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2020 |
CategoryP00 - Property - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew London County, CT |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
SUMMONS
Date: March 27, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: March 27, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 27, 2020APPEARANCE Thomas Coty
Date: November 05, 2020FORECLOSURE MEDIATION REQUEST/CERTIFICATE JD-CV-108 RESULT: Order 11/9/2020 BY THE CLERK
Date: November 05, 2020FORECLOSURE MEDIATOR'S REPORT
Date: September 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT Federal Mortgage Foreclosure Moratorium
Date: June 24, 2021FORECLOSURE MEDIATOR'S FINAL REPORT - MEDIATION PERIOD TERMINATED
Date: October 10, 2023ORDER Mediation extended to 11/18/22 RESULT: Granted 10/19/2022 HON KEVIN MURPHY
Date: October 19, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 2/7/2023 HON KEVIN MURPHY
Date: February 07, 2023ORDER Assigned to FMP RESULT: Order 11/9/2020 BY THE CLERK
Date: November 09, 2020ORDER RESULT: Order 6/10/2021 HON HARRY CALMAR
Date: June 10, 2021FORECLOSURE MEDIATOR'S FINAL REPORT - MEDIATION PERIOD TERMINATED
Date: January 17, 2023MOTION TO DISMISS PB 10-30
Date: April 09, 2024ORDER RESULT: Denied 1/13/2023 HON KEVIN MURPHY
Date: January 13, 2023MOTION TO CITE ADDITIONAL PARTY RESULT: Granted 11/28/2023 HON JAMES SPALLONE
Date: November 06, 2023FORECLOSURE MEDIATOR'S REPORT
Date: January 05, 2023ORDER Mediation extended to 1/20/23 RESULT: Granted 11/21/2022 HON KEVIN MURPHY
Date: November 21, 2022REQUEST TO AMEND COMPLAINT/AMENDMENT
Date: February 26, 2024FORECLOSURE MEDIATOR'S REPORT
Date: August 03, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 RESULT: Order 3/21/2024 BY THE CLERK
Date: March 01, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 3/21/2024 BY THE CLERK
Date: March 21, 2024FORECLOSURE MEDIATOR’S PREMEDIATION REPORT
Date: October 04, 2021MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 11/18/2022 HON KEVIN MURPHY
Date: November 17, 2022FORECLOSURE MEDIATOR'S REPORT
Date: November 09, 2021ORDER Premediation extended to 10/5/2021 RESULT: Granted 8/31/2021 HON HARRY CALMAR
Date: August 31, 2021FORECLOSURE MEDIATOR'S REPORT
Date: December 28, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/18/2022 HON KEVIN MURPHY
Date: November 18, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE MTC / RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 06, 2024FORECLOSURE MEDIATOR'S REPORT
Date: March 02, 2022MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY And Appearance RESULT: Granted 2/27/2023 HON KEVIN MURPHY
Date: February 10, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/28/2023 HON JAMES SPALLONE
Date: November 28, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 3/21/2024 BY THE CLERK
Date: March 01, 2024FORECLOSURE MEDIATOR’S PREMEDIATION REPORT
Date: June 29, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/15/2023 HON KEVIN MURPHY
Date: March 15, 2023ORDER Reinclusion- Granted RESULT: Granted 3/16/2023 HON KEVIN MURPHY
Date: March 16, 2023FORECLOSURE MEDIATOR'S REPORT
Date: September 16, 2022MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 4/25/2022 HON ROBERT YOUNG
Date: April 25, 2022MOTION TO CITE ADDITIONAL PARTY RESULT: Granted 3/4/2024 HON JAMES SPALLONE
Date: February 14, 2024ORDER Assigned to FMP RESULT: Order 3/16/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: March 16, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/27/2023 HON KEVIN MURPHY
Date: February 27, 2023ORDER Mediation extended to 6/15/22 RESULT: Granted 4/25/2022 HON ROBERT YOUNG
Date: April 25, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/21/2024 BY THE CLERK
Date: March 21, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/25/2022 HON ROBERT YOUNG
Date: April 25, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/4/2024 HON JAMES SPALLONE
Date: March 04, 2024MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY w/appearance attached
Date: April 03, 2024ORDER Noted RESULT: Off 1/24/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: January 24, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/5/2023 HON KEVIN MURPHY
Date: June 05, 2023ORDER Mediation extended to 8/5/22 RESULT: Granted 6/20/2022 HON ROBERT YOUNG
Date: June 20, 2022FORECLOSURE MEDIATOR'S REPORT
Date: August 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS PB 10-30 | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY w/appearance attached | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION re: Mot. to Dismiss Lack of Standing/Subject Matt. Last Updated: Additional Description - 03/26/2024 | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 3/21/2024 BY THE CLERK | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/21/2024 BY THE CLERK | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE MTC / RETURN OF SERVICE | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/4/2024 HON JAMES SPALLONE | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 RESULT: Order 3/21/2024 BY THE CLERK | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 3/21/2024 BY THE CLERK | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO AMEND COMPLAINT/AMENDMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.