Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Anthony English, Gary Duck, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Patricia Conklin, in the jurisdiction of New London County, CT, . New London County, CT Superior Courts with Shari A. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShari A. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2019 |
CategoryV01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew London County, CT |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ORDER RESULT: Order 5/13/2020 HON SHARI MURPHY
Date: May 13, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/3/2020 BY THE COURT
Date: March 03, 2020MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9)
Date: April 07, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/3/2020 HON SHARI MURPHY
Date: June 03, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER BY AGREEMENT C50,T02,T03,T11,T12,T61,V01,V04, V09 CASES
Date: February 06, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: December 09, 2019ANSWER
Date: January 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL IN PART | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | OFFER OF COMPROMISE Offer of Compromise-Anthony English | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | OFFER OF COMPROMISE Offer of Compromise-Gary Duck | |
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/3/2020 HON SHARI MURPHY | |
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Supplemental Compliance | |
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE DISCOVERY MOTION OR REQUEST PB CH13 RESULT: Granted 6/3/2020 HON SHARI MURPHY | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 5/13/2020 HON SHARI MURPHY | |
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |
April 29, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER Motion to Compel re Discovery RESULT: Order 5/13/2020 HON SHARI MURPHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.