Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Edward D. Cosden Jr, Theresa A. Cosden, filed a(n) P90 - Property - All Other case represented by Difrancesca & Steele Pc, against Town Of Groton, represented by Suisman Shapiro Wool Brennan Gray & Gree, in the jurisdiction of New London County, CT, . New London County, CT Superior Courts with Thomas A. Bishop presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 18, 2017 |
CategoryP90 - Property - All Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNew London County, CT |
|
MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH STIPULATION RESULT: Granted 10/24/2017 HON TIMOTHY BATES
Date: September 28, 2017ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/24/2017 HON TIMOTHY BATES
Date: October 24, 2017CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: June 07, 2017NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES & REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION (1ST SET)
Date: May 31, 2017SUMMONS
Date: April 18, 2017APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: May 19, 2017RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 18, 2017ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/12/2017 HON TIMOTHY BATES
Date: September 12, 2017ORDER RESULT: Accepted 9/12/2017 HON TIMOTHY BATES
Date: September 12, 2017SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Accepted 9/12/2017 HON TIMOTHY BATES
Date: September 12, 2017OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES/PRODUCTION PB 13-8 and 13-10
Date: September 08, 2017ANSWER
Date: June 05, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: April 18, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/24/2017 HON TIMOTHY BATES | |
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION BEFORE TRIAL COMMENCED RESULT: HON TIMOTHY BATES | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH STIPULATION RESULT: Granted 10/24/2017 HON TIMOTHY BATES | |
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/12/2017 HON TIMOTHY BATES | |
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) Caseflow Request to Continue 9/14/17 Status Conference RESULT: Granted 9/12/2017 HON TIMOTHY BATES | |
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Accepted 9/12/2017 HON TIMOTHY BATES | |
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Accepted 9/12/2017 HON TIMOTHY BATES | |
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES/PRODUCTION PB 13-8 and 13-10 | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INTERROGATORIES OR PRODUCTION REQ P.B. 13-7(a)(2)/13-10(a)(2) | |
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION JD-CV-130 RESULT: Granted 6/26/2017 HON THOMAS BISHOP Last Updated: Result Information - 06/26/2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.