Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fordham Housing, Llc, filed a(n) P90 - Property - All Other case represented by Donlan Sean E. Law Firm Of, against City Of New London, City Of New London Board Of Assessment Appeals, represented by Conway Londregan Sheehan & Monaco P.C., in the jurisdiction of New London County, CT, . New London County, CT Superior Courts with Thomas A. Bishop presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2016 |
CategoryP90 - Property - All Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNew London County, CT |
|
ORDER RESULT: Order 12/8/2016 HON TIMOTHY BATES
Date: December 08, 2016ANSWER
Date: July 25, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: June 15, 2016ORDER RESULT: Order 4/18/2017 HON LEELAND COLE-CHU
Date: April 18, 2017ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/11/2017 HON THOMAS BISHOP
Date: January 11, 2017CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 1/11/2017 HON THOMAS BISHOP
Date: January 10, 2017CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: October 17, 2016APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: June 23, 2016RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 15, 2016SUMMONS
Date: June 15, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION BEFORE TRIAL COMMENCED RESULT: HON LEELAND COLE-CHU | |
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 4/18/2017 HON LEELAND COLE-CHU | |
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH STIPULATION RESULT: Order 4/18/2017 HON LEELAND COLE-CHU | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/11/2017 HON THOMAS BISHOP | |
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 1/11/2017 HON THOMAS BISHOP | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 12/8/2016 HON TIMOTHY BATES | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.