Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Susan Bird-Kelly Administratrix Of The Estate Of Kenneth Bird, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Difrancesca & Steele Pc, against Dianne M. Swan Fka Bird, Dianne M., Great American Life Insurance Company, represented by Locke Lord Llp, Lucas Law P.C., in the jurisdiction of New London County, CT, . New London County, CT Superior Courts with Thomas A. Bishop presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2014 |
CategoryC90 - Contracts - All Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew London County, CT |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/31/2015 HON THOMAS BISHOP
Date: March 31, 2015COMPLAINT BY THIRD PARTY Regarding Annuity Policy
Date: April 14, 2015JUDGMENT FILE RESULT: Order 3/4/2016 BY THE CLERK-ADMIN ACTION
Date: January 19, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: May 12, 2014MOTION TO IMPLEAD RESULT: Granted 2/19/2015 HON LEELAND COLE-CHU
Date: October 14, 2014REPLY MEMORANDUM Defendant's Mediation Statement
Date: January 12, 2016ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE Answer and Special Defense and Certification
Date: August 22, 2014REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE AND ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM
Date: October 19, 2015STIPULATION DRAFT STIPULATION Last Updated: Additional Description - 01/13/2016
Date: January 11, 2016RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 14, 2015CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: November 03, 2014WITHDRAWAL #111 Summons and Complaint
Date: April 14, 2015PROPOSED JUDGMENT FILE
Date: January 19, 2016ORDER RESULT: Order 3/4/2016 BY THE CLERK-ADMIN ACTION
Date: March 04, 2016ORDER RESULT: Order 12/9/2015 HON ROBERT LEUBA
Date: December 09, 2015REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE AND ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM
Date: October 20, 2015MOTION FOR JUDGMENT RESULT: Granted 10/21/2015 HON THOMAS BISHOP
Date: October 16, 2015ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/21/2015 HON THOMAS BISHOP
Date: October 21, 2015ORDER RESULT: Denied 11/5/2015 BY THE CLERK
Date: November 05, 2015NOTICE
Date: October 02, 2015MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Denied 11/5/2015 BY THE CLERK
Date: October 16, 2015SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Summons and Third Party Complaint
Date: April 14, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PB 10-40
Date: October 14, 2014ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/19/2015 HON LEELAND COLE-CHU
Date: February 19, 2015ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/14/2014 HON TERENCE ZEMETIS
Date: October 14, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PB 10-40
Date: August 26, 2014ORDER RESULT: Order 8/15/2014 BY THE CLERK
Date: August 15, 2014MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Order 8/15/2014 BY THE CLERK
Date: July 30, 2014MOTION TO STRIKE SPECIAL DEFENSES RESULT: Granted 10/14/2014 HON TERENCE ZEMETIS
Date: August 26, 2014APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 28, 2015RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 12, 2014ORDER RESULT: Denied 7/9/2014 BY THE CLERK
Date: July 09, 2014APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: June 10, 2014SUMMONS
Date: May 12, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 3/4/2016 BY THE CLERK-ADMIN ACTION | |
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FILE RESULT: Order 3/4/2016 BY THE CLERK-ADMIN ACTION | |
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | PROPOSED JUDGMENT FILE | |
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | REPLY MEMORANDUM Defendant's Mediation Statement | |
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 1/12/2016 HON THOMAS BISHOP Last Updated: Additional Description - 01/13/2016 | |
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION BEFORE TRIAL COMMENCED RESULT: HON THOMAS BISHOP | |
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION DRAFT STIPULATION Last Updated: Additional Description - 01/13/2016 | |
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 12/9/2015 HON ROBERT LEUBA | |
November 19, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT OF INTERPLEADER PB 23-44 RESULT: Order 12/9/2015 HON ROBERT LEUBA | |
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Denied 11/5/2015 BY THE CLERK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.