Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mall, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Dubicki & Camassar Llp, against Debra Holt, Gary Newsome, represented by Norman P Laskey, in the jurisdiction of New London County, CT, . New London County, CT Superior Courts with Thomas A. Bishop presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2013 |
CategoryC40 - Contracts - Collections |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew London County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/19/2014 HON THOMAS BISHOP
Date: March 19, 2014ORDER RESULT: Order 5/30/2014 HON THOMAS PARKER
Date: May 30, 2014ORDER Judgment RESULT: Granted 8/4/2014 HON THOMAS PARKER
Date: August 04, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER Judgment RESULT: Granted 8/4/2014 HON THOMAS PARKER | |
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BY STIPULATION BEFORE TRIAL COMMENCED RESULT: HON THOMAS PARKER | |
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event | TRANSCRIPT Mediation May 13, 2014 | |
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 5/30/2014 HON THOMAS PARKER | |
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH STIPULATION RESULT: Granted 8/4/2014 HON THOMAS PARKER | |
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/19/2014 HON THOMAS BISHOP | |
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 3/19/2014 HON THOMAS BISHOP | |
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST | |
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event | ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.