Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Unifund Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Tobin & Marohn, against Joe Apicelli, represented by 86 Morse Avenue, in the jurisdiction of New London County, CT, . New London County, CT Superior Courts with Thomas A. Bishop presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 26, 2013 |
CategoryC40 - Contracts - Collections |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew London County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/20/2013 HON THOMAS BISHOP
Date: November 20, 2013ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/9/2014 HON THOMAS PARKER
Date: June 09, 2014ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/17/2013 BY THE CLERK
Date: May 17, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/9/2014 HON THOMAS PARKER | |
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BY STIPULATION BEFORE TRIAL COMMENCED RESULT: HON THOMAS PARKER | |
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS | |
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH STIPULATION RESULT: Granted 6/9/2014 HON THOMAS PARKER | |
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/20/2013 HON THOMAS BISHOP | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) for continuance of Status Conference scheduled for 11/21/13 2 PM at Norwich Superior Court | |
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST | |
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
May 17, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/17/2013 BY THE CLERK | |
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 5/17/2013 BY THE CLERK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.