Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Heather Quigley Wallace, against Melvyn Orenstein, represented by 2 Beacon Hill Drive, in the jurisdiction of New London County, CT, . New London County, CT Superior Courts with Thomas A. Bishop presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2013 |
CategoryC40 - Contracts - Collections |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew London County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/26/2015 HON ROBERT LEUBA
Date: February 26, 2015ORDER RESULT: Order 11/21/2014 HON THOMAS BISHOP
Date: November 21, 2014ORDER RESULT: Order 10/8/2013 HON PAUL VASINGTON
Date: October 08, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED | |
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/26/2015 HON ROBERT LEUBA | |
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL-GENERAL RESULT: HON ROBERT LEUBA | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON DEFAULT RESULT: Granted 2/26/2015 HON ROBERT LEUBA | |
November 21, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 11/21/2014 HON THOMAS BISHOP | |
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST | |
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 10/8/2013 HON PAUL VASINGTON | |
October 07, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.