Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Barbara Eastwood, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Moore O'Brien & Foti, against Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois, Tyrone Peters, represented by Bartlett & Grippe Llc, Hanks Olsen & Sheehan, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts with ROBERT D ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2022 |
CategoryV01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
LIST OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF THE LIVE TESTIMONY OF AN EXPERT WITNESS Supplemental
Date: January 16, 2024DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Supplemental
Date: May 10, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/4/2024 HON ROBERT D ANDREA
Date: March 04, 2024SUMMONS
Date: December 21, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2022MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RESULT: Denied 8/28/2023 HON ROBERT D ANDREA
Date: August 10, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE As to #101
Date: March 16, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RESULT: Granted 3/4/2024 HON ROBERT D ANDREA
Date: February 16, 2024SCHEDULING ORDER BY AGREEMENT C50,T02,T03,T11,T12,T61,V01,V04, V09 CASES
Date: February 22, 2023NOTICE Notice of Service on Plaintiff
Date: February 07, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/13/2024 HON ROBERT D ANDREA
Date: February 13, 2024NOTICE of Service of Discovery as to Barbara Eastwood
Date: February 15, 2024APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: February 15, 2024MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 3/4/2024 HON ROBERT D ANDREA
Date: February 15, 2024MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RESULT: Granted 10/23/2023 HON ROBERT D ANDREA
Date: October 04, 2023NOTICE
Date: February 15, 2024APPEARANCE
Date: August 10, 2023OFFER OF COMPROMISE
Date: January 23, 2024NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: August 02, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: February 02, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: December 21, 2022AMENDED WRIT AND SUMMONS
Date: March 05, 2024MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9)
Date: July 19, 2023LIST OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF THE LIVE TESTIMONY OF AN EXPERT WITNESS
Date: March 16, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 8/28/2023 HON ROBERT D ANDREA
Date: August 28, 2023NOTICE of Service of Discovery as to Tyrone Peters
Date: February 15, 2024NOTICE
Date: May 03, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/23/2023 HON ROBERT D ANDREA
Date: October 23, 2023DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS
Date: March 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
June 13, 2024 | Trial Management Conference | ||
June 06, 2024 | Trial Management Conference | ||
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | AMENDED WRIT AND SUMMONS | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/4/2024 HON ROBERT D ANDREA | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RESULT: Granted 3/4/2024 HON ROBERT D ANDREA | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE of Service of Discovery as to Barbara Eastwood | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 3/4/2024 HON ROBERT D ANDREA | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.