Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Thomas Bink, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Gould Law Group Llc, against Juvy Clarke, William Clarke, represented by Howard Kohn Sprague & Fitzgerald, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts with Carl J. Schuman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2020 |
CategoryT03 - Torts - Defective Premises - Private - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Summary Judgment #134
Date: October 08, 2021ORDER RESULT: Off 1/3/2022 BY THE CLERK
Date: January 03, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Supplemental Compliance for Thomas Bink
Date: September 16, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD Motion for Default for Failure to Plead
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBITS to Memo of law Supporting Motion for Summary Judgment #135
Date: October 08, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: July 29, 2020CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: September 02, 2021OFFER OF COMPROMISE to William Clarke
Date: April 06, 2021OFFER OF COMPROMISE to Juvy Clarke
Date: April 06, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Supplemental
Date: October 02, 2020MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 RESULT: Order 2/19/2021 BY THE CLERK
Date: February 10, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 09, 2020NOTICE Of Service Upon Both Defendants, William Clarke and Juvy Clarke
Date: July 02, 2020MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD
Date: September 24, 2020NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Supplemental Compliance for Thomas Bink
Date: July 12, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: September 08, 2020OFFER OF COMPROMISE Offers of Compromise as to both defendants
Date: November 10, 2021APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: June 26, 2020WITHDRAWAL Offers of Compromise (#123 and #124)
Date: November 08, 2021CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: November 12, 2021CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) to adjourn 2/17 hearing RESULT: Order 2/16/2022 HON CARL SCHUMAN
Date: February 15, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 2/16/2022 HON CARL SCHUMAN
Date: February 16, 2022APPEARANCE
Date: February 19, 2021MOTION FOR ORDER Plaintiff's Motion to Suspend Practice Book Sec. 17-45(b)
Date: April 01, 2022RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Response to Objection to MSJ
Date: April 11, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 3/18/2022 HON CARL SCHUMAN
Date: March 18, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/10/2022 HON CARL SCHUMAN
Date: April 10, 2022RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Response to Objection to MSJ - Paginated
Date: April 12, 2022APPEARANCE
Date: April 20, 2022APPEARANCE
Date: April 19, 2022MEMORANDUM OF DECISION
Date: April 22, 2022WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION AGAINST PARTICULAR DEFENDANT(S) – CASE REMAINS PENDING
Date: June 08, 2022CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116)
Date: April 20, 2022SUMMONS
Date: June 09, 2020MOTION TO INTERVENE
Date: February 19, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2020WITHDRAWAL OF APPORTIONMENT COMPLAINT
Date: June 08, 2022REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: November 12, 2021MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESULT: Off 1/3/2022 BY THE CLERK
Date: October 08, 2021ANSWER TO INTERVENING COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint
Date: September 02, 2021OBJECTION TO MOTION Plaintiff?s Objection To Defendant?s Motion to Strike
Date: June 30, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/10/2021 BY THE COURT
Date: June 10, 2021CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116)
Date: June 09, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 4/22/2021 BY THE CLERK
Date: April 22, 2021COMPLAINT BY INTERVENING PARTY
Date: February 19, 2021MOTION TO STRIKE Memorandum in Support filed by William and Juvy Clarke
Date: March 08, 2021ORDER RESULT: Denied 7/6/2021 HON SALVATORE AGATI
Date: July 06, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 2/19/2021 BY THE CLERK
Date: February 19, 2021AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 29, 2020REPLY
Date: November 23, 2020ORDER RESULT: Order 12/7/2020 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: December 07, 2020OBJECTION TO REQUEST TO REVISE RESULT: Order 12/7/2020 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: November 20, 2020COMPLAINT BY THIRD PARTY
Date: November 16, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/16/2020 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: November 16, 2020SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FOR APPORTIONMENT AS SERVED CGS SEC 52-102b
Date: October 14, 2020MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 01, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/19/2020 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: October 19, 2020MOTION TO IMPLEAD RESULT: Granted 10/19/2020 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: October 01, 2020REQUEST TO REVISE
Date: September 30, 2020MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9)
Date: September 04, 2020ORDER re #106 RESULT: Denied 10/28/2020 BY THE CLERK
Date: October 28, 2020ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/10/2020 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: August 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION AGAINST PARTICULAR DEFENDANT(S) – CASE REMAINS PENDING | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF APPORTIONMENT COMPLAINT | |
June 08, 2022 | Remote Status Conference | ||
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF DECISION | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
April 18, 2022 | Short Calendar SC-12 #005 | ||
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Response to Objection to MSJ - Paginated | |
April 12, 2022 | Remote Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.