Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Kanaji Cooper, Tymar Cooper, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by 19 Amity St., against Leana Maldonado, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Jane K. Grossman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2024 |
CategoryF40 - Family - Custody Application - C.G.S. 46B-61 |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2024 | Resolution Plan Date | ||
April 11, 2024 | Resolution Plan Date | ||
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Denied 4/10/2024 HON JANE GROSSMAN | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Denied 4/10/2024 HON JANE GROSSMAN | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION - PUBLIC ASSISTANCE | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PARTY PARTICIPATION IN PARENTING EDUCATION PROGRAM CGS SEC 46B-69B | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | CUSTODY APPLICATION | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | FINDING OF INABILITY TO PAY PARENTING EDUCATION PROGRAM FEE CGS SEC. 46b-69b(c) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.