Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Sonia L Santos Larios, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Bershtein Bershtein & Bershtein Pc, against Bozzuto'S Inc, Msw Realty Llc, represented by Nuzzo & Roberts Llc, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Robin L. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2023 |
CategoryT03 - Torts - Defective Premises - Private - Other |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint involves Sonia L. Santos Larios suing Bozzuto's Inc. and MSW Realty LLC for negligence resulting in injuries sustained by Sonia. The complaint states that on January 17, 2022, Sonia fell and was injured due to ice on the sidewalk in fr...
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD
Date: March 25, 2024APPEARANCE
Date: February 01, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 19, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/15/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: March 15, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/20/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: February 20, 2024MOTION TO INTERVENE RESULT: Granted 2/20/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: February 01, 2024NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY ON DEFENDANTS
Date: February 20, 2024MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 3/15/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: February 23, 2024SUMMONS
Date: December 19, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: December 19, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: January 25, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/15/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 3/15/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/20/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY ON DEFENDANTS | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO INTERVENE RESULT: Granted 2/20/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.