Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Beatrice Zampano, filed a(n) T90 - Torts - All Other case represented by Martha Sloan Triplett, against Motion To Consolidate, Topnotch Care Services, Llc, represented by Miles David Esty, Pat Labbadia Iii, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Karen A. Goodrow presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2023 |
CategoryT90 - Torts - All Other |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This is a legal complaint filed by Beatrice Zampano against Topnotch Care Services, LLC, alleging vicarious liability. The complaint states that Topnotch Care Services provided non-medical homecare services and that a caregiver provided by the compan...
MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Date: January 17, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: December 07, 2023Limited Appearance JD-CL-121
Date: January 17, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 2/9/2024 HON KAREN GOODROW
Date: February 09, 2024APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: January 09, 2024SUMMONS
Date: December 07, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/9/2024 HON KAREN GOODROW
Date: February 09, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 07, 2023MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/9/2024 HON KAREN GOODROW
Date: February 07, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
October 10, 2024 | Trial Management Conference | ||
March 20, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 2/9/2024 HON KAREN GOODROW | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/9/2024 HON KAREN GOODROW | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/9/2024 HON KAREN GOODROW | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER BY AGREEMENT C50,T02,T03,T11,T12,T61,V01,V04, V09 CASES RESULT: Order 2/9/2024 HON KAREN GOODROW | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Limited Appearance JD-CL-121 | |
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.