Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Garrison Gazvoda, Grant Gazvoda, filed a(n) T90 - Torts - All Other case represented by Loughlin Law Pc, against Maiorano Funeral Home Inc., Nicholas A Forte, represented by Charles L Kurmay, Garraty Cynthia M. Law Offices, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Robin L. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2023 |
CategoryT90 - Torts - All Other |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint involves a dispute between Garrison Gazvoda, Grant Gazvoda, Nicholas Forte, and Maiorano Funeral Home Inc. The first count alleges interference with the right to custody of remains by Nicholas Forte. It states that after the death of G...
REPLY Reply to Objection to Request to Revise
Date: February 14, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: December 04, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 04, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: February 01, 2024APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: December 26, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSION PB 13-22
Date: March 14, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/21/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: February 21, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 2/21/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: February 21, 2024SUMMONS
Date: December 04, 2023OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR NONSUIT #110.00 RESULT: Overruled 4/12/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: March 25, 2024WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION No. 106.00 Revised Complaint is withdrawn
Date: February 27, 2024OBJECTION Objection to Defendant's Request to Revise
Date: February 06, 2024NOTICE Notice of Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Request for Production
Date: March 25, 2024REQUEST TO AMEND COMPLAINT/AMENDMENT
Date: April 09, 2024COMPLAINT Revised Complaint
Date: February 27, 2024ORDER RESULT: Overruled 4/12/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: April 12, 2024REPLY Reply to Plaintiffs' Objection to Motion for Nonsuit
Date: April 03, 2024REQUEST TO REVISE
Date: January 25, 2024CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE correcting Objection #111.00 certification
Date: March 25, 2024WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION #115.00 REQUEST TO AMEND COMPLAINT/AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 15, 2024MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 2/21/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: February 01, 2024ORDER RESULT: Denied 4/12/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON
Date: April 12, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2024 | Remote Short Calendar Motion- Other Hearing | ||
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION #115.00 REQUEST TO AMEND COMPLAINT/AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
April 15, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-15 #043 | ||
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Overruled 4/12/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Denied 4/12/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO AMEND COMPLAINT/AMENDMENT | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | REPLY Reply to Plaintiffs' Objection to Motion for Nonsuit | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR NONSUIT #110.00 RESULT: Overruled 4/12/2024 HON ROBIN WILSON | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE Notice of Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Request for Production | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE correcting Objection #111.00 certification |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.