Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
City Of New Haven, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Zullo Zullo & Jacks Law Office Llc, against Greater New Haven Water Pollution Control Authority, Israel Z. Williams, Jamilah J. Wali, Motion To Intervene, South Central Connecticut Regional Water Authority, (total of 7) See All represented by 37 Lines St, Reveley William G. & Associates Llc, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2023 |
CategoryP00 - Property - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
CASEFLOW REQUEST - FAMILY MATTERS (FORM JD-FM-292)
Date: September 05, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 RESULT: Denied 9/19/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: September 05, 2023APPRAISAL
Date: February 07, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/25/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: October 25, 2023OATH OF APPRAISERS
Date: February 07, 2024MOTION TO INTERVENE
Date: September 05, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 RESULT: Granted 8/31/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: August 23, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 10/25/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: October 25, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/1/2024 HON WALTER SPADER
Date: April 01, 2024ORDER RESULT: Denied 9/19/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: September 19, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/24/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: November 24, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 11/24/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: November 15, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/5/2023 HON WALTER SPADER
Date: September 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 12, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Denied 10/25/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: October 17, 2023DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF DEFENSE PB 13-19
Date: July 27, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 RESULT: Granted 10/25/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: October 17, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 9/5/2023 HON WALTER SPADER
Date: September 05, 2023SUMMONS
Date: June 23, 2023APPEARANCE
Date: September 05, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: July 21, 2023MOTION TO CITE ADDITIONAL PARTY
Date: March 18, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/31/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: August 31, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20
Date: July 18, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: June 23, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/1/2024 HON WALTER SPADER | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CITE ADDITIONAL PARTY | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | APPRAISAL | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | OATH OF APPRAISERS | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
November 24, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/24/2023 BY THE CLERK | |
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 11/24/2023 BY THE CLERK | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/25/2023 BY THE CLERK | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Denied 10/25/2023 BY THE CLERK | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Denied 10/25/2023 BY THE CLERK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.