Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Lance Vaughan, filed a(n) T90 - Torts - All Other case represented by Stevens Thomas E The Law Office Of Pllc, against William Anthony Gargone Iii, represented by Mulvey Oliver Gould & Crotta, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts with Elizabeth J. Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth J. Stewart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2023 |
CategoryT90 - Torts - All Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
|
ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/20/2024 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: February 20, 2024NOTICE Plaintiff's notice of service of discovery to defendants
Date: July 10, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/7/2023 HON MICHAEL KAMP
Date: August 07, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 02, 2023NOTICE Notice of Service of Request for DP
Date: July 18, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 24, 2023CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: July 19, 2023SUMMONS
Date: June 02, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD
Date: July 21, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/13/2023 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: November 13, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Compliance William Gargone III
Date: January 19, 2024CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST Certificate of closed pleadings
Date: December 08, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Compliance William Gargone
Date: January 19, 2024APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: July 10, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: June 02, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/16/2023 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: October 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
May 09, 2024 | Trial Management Conference | ||
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/20/2024 HON ELIZABETH STEWART | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9) RESULT: Granted 2/20/2024 HON ELIZABETH STEWART | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Compliance William Gargone III | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Compliance William Gargone | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST Certificate of closed pleadings | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/13/2023 HON ELIZABETH STEWART | |
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE DISCOVERY MOTION OR REQUEST PB CH13 additional 60 days RESULT: Granted 11/13/2023 HON ELIZABETH STEWART | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/16/2023 HON ELIZABETH STEWART |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.