Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Neftali Gomez, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by D'Elia Gillooly Depalma Llc, against New Haven Solid Waste & Recycling Authority, represented by Law Offices Of Stacy B Walker, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts with Elizabeth J. Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth J. Stewart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2023 |
CategoryT03 - Torts - Defective Premises - Private - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/20/2024 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: February 20, 2024CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: May 01, 2023CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: April 04, 2023ORDER RESULT: Off 10/23/2023 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: October 23, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: July 10, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER BY AGREEMENT C50,T02,T03,T11,T12,T61,V01,V04, V09 CASES
Date: June 08, 2023MOTION TO INTERVENE RESULT: Off 10/23/2023 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: October 06, 2023ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: April 28, 2023MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9)
Date: January 03, 2024REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: May 01, 2023MOTION TO INTERVENE RESULT: Granted 10/23/2023 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: October 10, 2023NOTICE DEFENDANT NOTICE OF SERVICE OF WORKER'S COMPENSATION DISCOVERY TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 27, 2023NOTICE DEFENDANT NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 13, 2023NOTICE Request for Disclosure and Production
Date: March 14, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/27/2023 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: March 27, 2023SUMMONS
Date: February 17, 2023APPEARANCE
Date: October 06, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Denied 5/4/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: April 26, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: February 17, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: February 27, 2023APPEARANCE
Date: October 10, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 5/4/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: May 04, 2023WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION
Date: January 03, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/23/2023 HON ELIZABETH STEWART
Date: October 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
August 05, 2024 | Trial Management Conference | ||
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/20/2024 HON ELIZABETH STEWART | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9) | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9) RESULT: Granted 2/20/2024 HON ELIZABETH STEWART | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Off 10/23/2023 HON ELIZABETH STEWART | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/23/2023 HON ELIZABETH STEWART | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO INTERVENE RESULT: Granted 10/23/2023 HON ELIZABETH STEWART | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.