Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Rahsean Heard, Rodney Heard, Schmara Mckiver, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Weber & Rubano Llc, against Diane Chambery, represented by Law Offices Of Dennis J Rinaldi, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts with Dennis G. Eveleigh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis G. Eveleigh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2023 |
CategoryV01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ANSWER
Date: May 01, 2023NOTICE of Service of Discovery Defendant, Diane Chambery
Date: May 16, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER BY AGREEMENT C50,T02,T03,T11,T12,T61,V01,V04, V09 CASES
Date: April 24, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: August 24, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 24, 2023ADDITIONAL PARTIES PAGE
Date: January 24, 2023SUMMONS
Date: January 24, 2023CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: February 07, 2023MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Denied 3/8/2024 HON DENNIS EVELEIGH
Date: March 08, 2024SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN Notice of Filing Supplemental Return
Date: May 16, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 9/18/2023 HON MICHAEL KAMP
Date: September 18, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE SCANNED NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: April 13, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE SCANNED NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLIANCE
Date: December 13, 2023MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9) Second
Date: September 22, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE SCANNED NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLIANCE
Date: September 28, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 3/8/2024 HON DENNIS EVELEIGH
Date: March 08, 2024NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE SCANNED NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLIANCE
Date: October 03, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE SCANNED NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLIANCE
Date: September 11, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE SCANNED NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLIANCE
Date: September 22, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: February 07, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: January 24, 2023CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: July 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
July 25, 2024 | Trial Management Conference | ||
March 11, 2024 | Pretrial Conference | ||
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Denied 3/8/2024 HON DENNIS EVELEIGH | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Denied 3/8/2024 HON DENNIS EVELEIGH | |
February 06, 2024 | Pretrial Conference | ||
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE SCANNED NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLIANCE | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE SCANNED NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLIANCE | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE SCANNED NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLIANCE | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9) Second |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.