Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. As Trustee For Mortgage Assets Management Series I Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mccalla Raymer Leibert Pierce Llc, against Albert A Mancuso Jr, Josephine Ann Mancuso, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, represented by Vincenzo Gallo, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Walter M. Spader, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2022 |
CategoryP00 - Property - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
COMMITTEE REPORT
Date: February 27, 2024APPRAISAL
Date: January 18, 2024AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT
Date: November 08, 2023BILL OF COSTS FILED FOR TAXATION BY CLERK - PB SEC 18-5 RESULT: Order 12/18/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: November 16, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: December 27, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: May 23, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2022MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF COMMITTEE SALE/DEED/REPORT/FEES AND EXPENSES/APPRAISER’S FEES JD-CV-99
Date: February 27, 2024AFFIDAVIT RE: ATTORNEY/COUNSEL FEES
Date: November 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT RE: ATTORNEY/COUNSEL FEES
Date: August 03, 2023REQUEST TO AMEND COMPLAINT/AMENDMENT
Date: February 13, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 3/23/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: March 23, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 9/7/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: August 30, 2023APPRAISAL
Date: July 31, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: January 08, 2024NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: November 16, 2023SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN
Date: March 15, 2023JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE BY SALE
Date: November 13, 2023SUMMONS
Date: December 27, 2022FORECLOSURE WORKSHEET JD-CV-77
Date: November 08, 2023DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF DEFENSE PB 13-19
Date: August 30, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Denied 8/9/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: July 18, 2023FORECLOSURE WORKSHEET JD-CV-77
Date: August 03, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/7/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: September 07, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/11/2024 HON WALTER SPADER
Date: March 11, 2024AFFIDAVIT RE: ATTORNEY/COUNSEL FEES
Date: May 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT
Date: May 01, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 8/3/2023 HON WALTER SPADER
Date: July 20, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/3/2023 HON WALTER SPADER
Date: August 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH EMAP
Date: May 01, 2023FORECLOSURE WORKSHEET JD-CV-77
Date: May 01, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 11/13/2023 HON WALTER SPADER
Date: November 13, 2023MOTION FOR JUDGMENT-STRICT FORECLOSURE
Date: April 14, 2023MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 01, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 12/18/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: December 18, 2023APPRAISAL
Date: April 17, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/13/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: April 13, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 8/9/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: August 09, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 RESULT: Order 3/23/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: March 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/11/2024 HON WALTER SPADER | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | COMMITTEE REPORT | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF COMMITTEE SALE/DEED/REPORT/FEES AND EXPENSES/APPRAISER’S FEES JD-CV-99 Signed- corrected | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF COMMITTEE SALE/DEED/REPORT/FEES AND EXPENSES/APPRAISER’S FEES JD-CV-99 | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO AMEND COMPLAINT/AMENDMENT | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | APPRAISAL | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 12/18/2023 BY THE CLERK | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS FILED FOR TAXATION BY CLERK - PB SEC 18-5 RESULT: Order 12/18/2023 BY THE CLERK | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.